Enjoy any 5 free lessons!
You can pick. No account needed.
Watch VideoBecome a member to get full access to our entire library of learning videos, reading material, quiz games, simple DIY activities & more.
Become a member to get full access to our entire library of learning videos, quiz games, & more.
Plans & Pricingto watch this full video.
Access All Videos
and Lessons, No Limits.
Access All Videos
No credit card required,
takes 7 sec to signup.
No card required
Readytogo lessons
that save you time.
Readytogo lessons
If you are on a school computer or network, ask your tech person to whitelist these URLs:
*.wistia.com, fast.wistia.com, fast.wistia.net, embedwistiaa.akamaihd.net
Sometimes a simple refresh solves this issue. If you need further help, contact us.
Multiplying Up To 4 Digits (Area Model)
 Show lesson plan & teacher guide
 Show answers to discussion questions
 Show video only
 Allow visiting of other pages
 Hide assessments
 How to multiply 4digit numbers by a onedigit number!
 How to multiply twodigits by twodigit numbers!
 And, we'll see that multiplying larger numbers can help us pack for camping, study fascinating new animals, and keep track of our favorite collections.

Discussion Questions

Before VideoWhat does 7 × 8 mean? ANSWER

7 × 8 means 7 groups of 8, or 8 + 8 + 8 + 8 + 8 + 8 + 8.

(5 + 2) × 8 = 40 + 16 = 56

I could draw a rectangle with 7 rows and 8 columns. There are 56 squares. The product is 56.

A rectangle with width 7 units and length 8 units has an area of 56 square units.

There are 6 groups of 5 tens, which is 30 tens. 30 tens is 300. 6 × 50 = 300.


After VideoHow could you multiply 9 × 35 using an area model? ANSWER

I could draw a rectangle and divide it into two sections. At the top I write 30 and 5. At the left side I write 9. Then I multiply 9 × 30, which is 270, and multiply 9 × 5, which is 45. Then I add the partial products: 270 + 45 = 315. 9 × 35 = 315.

The number 35 is 3 tens and 5 ones. The left box is tens, so I write 30, and the right box is ones, so I write 5.

I would need 2 more boxes, one for the hundreds place and one for the thousands place. Then I would label them 4,000 and 700. Then I can multiply 9 × 4,000, which is 36,000, and 9 × 700, which is 6,300. Then I add all four partial products: 36,000 + 6,300 + 270 + 45 = 42,615. 9 × 4,735 = 42,615.

I could draw a rectangle and divide it into four sections. At the top I would write 80 and 1 above the two sections. At the top left side I would write 20 and the bottom left side I would write 6. Then I multiply in each section: 20 × 80 = 1,600, 20 × 1= 20, 6 × 80 = 480, and 6 × 1 = 6. Then add the parts: 1,600 + 20 + 480 + 6 = 2,106. So 26 × 81 = 2,106.

No. She multiplied 50 × 30 = 1,500 and 7 × 4 = 28. She left out two more partial products: 50 × 4 = 200 and 7 × 30 = 210. The product is 1,938.



Vocabulary

Multiply
DEFINE
Add equal groups.

Digit
DEFINE
One of the symbols from 0 to 9.

Repeated Addition
DEFINE
Adding equal groups together.

Area
DEFINE
The number of square units needed to cover a surface.

Area Model
DEFINE
A diagram in which the length and width of a rectangle represents factors and the area represents the product.

Rectangle
DEFINE
A plane figure with 4 straight sides and 4 right angles.

Place Value
DEFINE
The value of a digit determined by its place in the numeral.

Friendly Number
DEFINE
An adjusted number that makes an operation easier to complete.

Vertical
DEFINE
Up and down.

Corresponding
DEFINE
Equivalent.

Partial Products
DEFINE
The product of a multiplicand and one digit of its multidigit multiplier.

Product
DEFINE
The answer to a multiplication problem.

Horizontal
DEFINE
Left to right.

Multiply
DEFINE

Reading Material
Download as PDF Download PDF View as Separate PageWHAT IS MULTIPLYING UP TO 4 DIGITS?An area model shows multiplication by giving the factors as side lengths of a rectangle. The product is the area of the rectangle. An area model makes things simpler by allowing you to divide the rectangle into smaller rectangles whose area is easier to find.
To better understand multiplying up to 4 digits…
WHAT IS MULTIPLYING UP TO 4 DIGITS?. An area model shows multiplication by giving the factors as side lengths of a rectangle. The product is the area of the rectangle. An area model makes things simpler by allowing you to divide the rectangle into smaller rectangles whose area is easier to find. To better understand multiplying up to 4 digits…LET’S BREAK IT DOWN!
Camping
Multiplying a 1digit number by a 2digit number can help you find how many snacks you need for a camping trip. Let’s say you are going camping for 6 days and you need 28 snacks a day for the group. How many snacks do you need altogether? We can figure this out by thinking of 28 as 20 + 8. We can multiply 6 × 20 = 120 and 6 × 8 = 48. Then we can add the products: 120 + 48 = 168. You need 168 snacks. Try this one yourself: You and your friends are headed to a carnival. There are 7 of you. Each person needs 43 tickets to ride all the rides. How many tickets do you need in total so that everyone can ride all the rides?
Camping Multiplying a 1digit number by a 2digit number can help you find how many snacks you need for a camping trip. Let’s say you are going camping for 6 days and you need 28 snacks a day for the group. How many snacks do you need altogether? We can figure this out by thinking of 28 as 20 + 8. We can multiply 6 × 20 = 120 and 6 × 8 = 48. Then we can add the products: 120 + 48 = 168. You need 168 snacks. Try this one yourself: You and your friends are headed to a carnival. There are 7 of you. Each person needs 43 tickets to ride all the rides. How many tickets do you need in total so that everyone can ride all the rides?Millipedes
Multiplying a 1digit number by a 3digit number can help you find how many total legs a group of millipedes has. Let’s say you see 3 millipedes and each millipede has 142 legs. How many legs do you see? We can figure this out by thinking of 142 as 100 + 40 + 2. We can multiply 3 × 100 = 300, 3 × 40 = 120, and 3 × 2 = 6. Then we can add the products. 300 + 120 + 6 = 426. There are 426 legs. Try this one yourself: You are on a hike and you see 7 millipedes. Each millipede has 142 legs. How many legs do you see in all?
Millipedes Multiplying a 1digit number by a 3digit number can help you find how many total legs a group of millipedes has. Let’s say you see 3 millipedes and each millipede has 142 legs. How many legs do you see? We can figure this out by thinking of 142 as 100 + 40 + 2. We can multiply 3 × 100 = 300, 3 × 40 = 120, and 3 × 2 = 6. Then we can add the products. 300 + 120 + 6 = 426. There are 426 legs. Try this one yourself: You are on a hike and you see 7 millipedes. Each millipede has 142 legs. How many legs do you see in all?Soccer Stadium
Multiplying a 1digit number by a 4digit number can help you find how many seats there are in a stadium. Let’s say the stadium has 4 sections. Each section has 2,316 seats. How many seats does the stadium have altogether? We can figure this out by thinking of 2,316 as 2000 + 300 + 10 + 6. We can multiply 4 × 2,000 = 8,000, 4 × 300 = 1,200, 4 × 10 = 40, and 4 × 6 = 24. Then we can add the products: 8,000 + 1,200 + 40 + 24 = 9,264. There are 9,264 seats. Try this one yourself: You need to decide if there are enough seats in the stadium for all fans to attend. There are 3 trains, and each train brings 3,104 people to the stadium. How many seats does the stadium need for all the people on the trains to attend? Does the stadium have enough seats?
Soccer Stadium Multiplying a 1digit number by a 4digit number can help you find how many seats there are in a stadium. Let’s say the stadium has 4 sections. Each section has 2,316 seats. How many seats does the stadium have altogether? We can figure this out by thinking of 2,316 as 2000 + 300 + 10 + 6. We can multiply 4 × 2,000 = 8,000, 4 × 300 = 1,200, 4 × 10 = 40, and 4 × 6 = 24. Then we can add the products: 8,000 + 1,200 + 40 + 24 = 9,264. There are 9,264 seats. Try this one yourself: You need to decide if there are enough seats in the stadium for all fans to attend. There are 3 trains, and each train brings 3,104 people to the stadium. How many seats does the stadium need for all the people on the trains to attend? Does the stadium have enough seats?Record Collection
Multiplying a 2digit number by a 2digit number can help you find how many records there are in a collection. Let’s say there are 14 boxes of records and each box contains 38 records. How many records are in the collection? We can figure this out by thinking of 14 as 10 + 4 and 38 as 30 + 8. We can multiply 10 × 30 = 300, 10 × 8 = 80, 4 × 30 = 120, and 4 × 8 = 32. Then we can add the products: 300 + 80 + 120 + 32 = 532. There are 532 records in the collection. Try this one yourself: You find 23 boxes of records in the garage. Each box contains 35 records. How many records do you have in all?
Record Collection Multiplying a 2digit number by a 2digit number can help you find how many records there are in a collection. Let’s say there are 14 boxes of records and each box contains 38 records. How many records are in the collection? We can figure this out by thinking of 14 as 10 + 4 and 38 as 30 + 8. We can multiply 10 × 30 = 300, 10 × 8 = 80, 4 × 30 = 120, and 4 × 8 = 32. Then we can add the products: 300 + 80 + 120 + 32 = 532. There are 532 records in the collection. Try this one yourself: You find 23 boxes of records in the garage. Each box contains 35 records. How many records do you have in all? 
Practice Word Problems

Practice Number Problems

Teacher Resources
These downloadable teacher resources can help you create a full lesson around the video. These PDFs incorporate using class discussion questions, vocabulary lists, printable math worksheets, quizzes, games, and more.
Select a Google Form
Choose a way to play this quiz game

Questions appear on the teacher's screen. Students answer on their own devices.
Start a Free Trial Today. Get a $5 Amazon Gift Card!
Teachers! Start a free trial & we'll send your gift card within 1 day. Only cards left. Try it now.
This email is associated with a Science Kit subscription. Kit subscriptions are managed on this separate page: Manage Subscription

Science & Math$_{/yr}

Science Only$_{/yr}
Use an area model to find the product 7 × 53.
Use an area model to find the product 8 × 692.
Eric found that the product of 28 × 64 is 1,232. Explain his error and find the correct product.
access all lessons
• No credit card required •
"My students loved the videos. I started the video subscription in May and used them as a review before the state test, which I know contributed to 100% of my class passing the state test."
Rhonda Fox 4th Grade Teacher, Ocala, Florida• No credit card required •
"My students loved the videos. I started the video subscription in May and used them as a review before the state test, which I know contributed to 100% of my class passing the state test."
Rhonda Fox 4th Grade Teacher, Ocala, Florida• No credit card required •
Already a member? Sign In
* no credit card required *
* no credit card required *
* no credit card required *
no credit card required
Skip, I will use a 3 day free trial
Enjoy your free 30 days trial

Unlimited access to our full library
of videos & lessons for grades K5. 
You won’t be billed unless you keep your
account open past your 14day free trial. 
You can cancel anytime in 1 click on the
manage account page or by emailing us.

Unlimited access to our full library of videos & lessons for grades K5.

You won't be billed unless you keep your account open past 14 days.

You can cancel anytime in 1click on the manage account page.
Cancel anytime in 1click on the manage account page before the trial ends and you won't be charged.
Otherwise you will pay just $10 CAD/month for the service as long as your account is open.
Cancel anytime on the manage account page in 1click and you won't be charged.
Otherwise you will pay $10 CAD/month for the service as long as your account is open.
We just sent you a confirmation email. Enjoy!
DonePlease login or join.